EP0094053 - Plasma method for making a dielectric rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beerwald, Hans Kalkgasse 2 D-5370 Kall-Sistig / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Günter Haarholzer Strasse 21 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 03 /
Glomski, Günter Zeppelinstrasse 5 D-4630 Bochum / DE | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/22] |
Former [1983/46] | Rasper, Joachim, Dr. Bierstadter Höhe 22 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104464.9 | 06.05.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | DE19823217839 | 12.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3217839 | [1983/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094053 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094053 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/025, C03B19/00 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
C03B19/01 (EP,US);
C03B19/1423 (EP,US);
C03B19/1476 (EP,US);
C03B37/01294 (EP,US);
C03B37/014 (EP,US);
C03B37/0142 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/46] | Title | German: | Plasmaverfahren zur Herstellung eines dielektrischen Stabes | [1983/46] | English: | Plasma method for making a dielectric rod | [1983/46] | French: | Procédé à plasma pour la fabrication d'une tige diélectrique | [1983/46] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/29] | 04.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4135901 (FUJIWARA KUNIO, et al); | [Y]FR2418777 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2605483 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]FR2313327 (QUARTZ & SILICE [FR]); | [XP]EP0072069 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | Examination | DE2715333 | DE2835326 | DE2913726 | DE2919619 |