Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
25.06.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] |
22.10.1986 | First examination report | |
15.01.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] |
19.11.1984 | Change - classification | published on 23.01.1985 [1985/04] |
07.05.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.07.1984 [1984/28] |
21.10.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.12.1983 [1983/51] |