Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0096225 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1988 | B1 | EP0096225 | 20.03.1985 | A3 | EP0096225 | 21.12.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US38713282 | 10.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3377690D1 | 15.09.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US38713282 | 10.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH024171B | 26.01.1990 | B2 | JPS58222620 | 24.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US38713282 | 10.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4506341 | 19.03.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US38713282 | 10.06.1982 |