EP0094575 - Compositions for treatment of disease states involving immunological factors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/47] | Methods and materials for treatment of disease states involving immunological factors | ||
[1988/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMichael, John P.O. Box 127 Westfall & Larry Hill Road, R.D. 1 Delanson, NY 12053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states MCMICHAEL, John P.O. Box 127 Westfall & Larry Hill Road, R.D. 1 Delanson, NY 12053 / US | ||
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states McMichael, John Post Office Box 81 Cambridge Springs Pennsylvania 16403 / US | ||
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY PATENTS, INC. 537 Newtown Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/29] |
Former [1983/47] | 01 /
McMichael, John Post Box 81 Cambridge Springs Crawford Pennsylvania / US | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104490.4 | 06.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | US19820378752 | 17.05.1982 Original published format: US 378752 | [1983/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094575 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094575 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094575 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, // (A61K39/00, 31:415) | [1983/47] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/00, A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K39/395, A61K31/415 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/47] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Krankheitszuständen die Bezug haben auf immunologische Faktoren | [1988/32] | English: | Compositions for treatment of disease states involving immunological factors | [1988/32] | French: | Compositions pour le traitement d'états pathologiques impliquant des facteurs immunologiques | [1988/32] |
Former [1983/47] | Methoden und Materialien zur Behandlung von Krankheitszuständen die Bezug haben auf immunologische Faktoren | ||
Former [1983/47] | Methods and materials for treatment of disease states involving immunological factors | ||
Former [1983/47] | Méthodes et matériaux pour le traitement d'états pathologiques impliquant des facteurs immunologiques | Examination procedure | 09.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 03.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE563791 ; | [AD]US4294818 (MCMICHAEL JOHN, et al) |