EP0094615 - Method for the manufacture of metal dental prostheses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wismann, Horst Gartenstrasse 22 D-8162 Schliersee / DE | [1983/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/47] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104649.5 | 11.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823218300 | 14.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3218300 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094615 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094615 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/08, A61C5/10 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
A61C13/0006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/47] | A61C13/08, A61C13/22, A61C5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Zahnersatzteilen aus Metall | [1983/47] | English: | Method for the manufacture of metal dental prostheses | [1983/47] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de prothèses dentaires en métal | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 16.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3997637 [ ] (ROGERS OLBERT WILLIAM) |