EP0094654 - Tracked vehicle frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1988 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Joseph John 2085 Admiral Street Dubuque Iowa / US | 02 /
Erickson, Paul Kevin 760 Duggan Drive, Apt. 4 Dubuque Iowa / US | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Werner, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Gramm, Werner, Prof. Dipl.-Ing., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104773.3 | 14.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | US19820378699 | 17.05.1982 Original published format: US 378699 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094654 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094654 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094654 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/10 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
B62D55/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Raupenfahrzeuggestell | [1983/47] | English: | Tracked vehicle frame | [1983/47] | French: | Châssis pour véhicule chenillé | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 05.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.09.1987 | [1989/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1944393 (BAKER DAVID B, et al); | [Y]US3924703 (PURCELL ROBERT J) |