EP0102454 - Carrier for a loom beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-35 D-42275 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölzel, Klaus Seelegrund 2 D-3250 Hameln 8 / DE | 02 /
Offensand, Wilfried Rückertstrasse 5c D-3250 Hameln 1 / DE | 03 /
Gutsmann, Horst Reimerdeskamp 4 D-3250 Hameln 1 / DE | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 83105015.8 | 20.05.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | DE19820024612U | 01.09.1982 Original published format: DE 8224612 U | [1984/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102454 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102454 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/66 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
B65D85/66 (EP);
B65H49/38 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Lager-, Transport- und Ablaufcontainer | [1984/11] | English: | Carrier for a loom beam | [1984/11] | French: | Transporteur d'ensouple | [1984/11] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 17.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/13] | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2314874 ; | [X]FR2506729 ; | [A]GB385037 ; | [A]US3147860 |