EP0119292 - Process for regulating the deposit of agricultural products on a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirchberger, Franz Lichtenfelser Strasse 43 D-8623 Staffelstein / DE | [1984/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105055.4 | 21.05.1983 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | DE19833312997 | 12.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3312997 | [1984/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119292 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119292 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/10, A01C15/00 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
A01C15/00 (EP);
A01C7/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung der Ausbringung von Kultiviergut auf eine landwirtschaftliche Nutzfläche | [1984/39] | English: | Process for regulating the deposit of agricultural products on a surface | [1984/39] | French: | Procédé de réglage de l'apport de produits agricoles sur une surface | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2119059 (HANS SACK); | [A]GB609989 (WESTERASMASKINER AB); | [A]US3679098 (WEISS PAUL C); | [A]US3912121 (STEFFEN RONALD W); | [A]DE2504725 (RIES ADOLF FA); | [A]US4232255 (CARLEN ERIC T) |