EP0095174 - Process for making polyetherimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parekh, Shashi Laxmidas 29, Flintstone Drive Pittsfield Massachusetts 01201 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Sieb, Rolf, et al Finstertal 12 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr., et al Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1985/11] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1983/48] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83105078.6 | 21.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820381859 | 25.05.1982 Original published format: US 381859 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095174 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095174 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095174 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
C08G73/1064 (EP,US);
C08G73/1053 (EP,US);
C08G73/106 (EP,US);
C08G73/1071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyetherimiden | [1983/48] | English: | Process for making polyetherimides | [1983/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de polyétherimides | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3875116 (HEATH DARRELL R, et al); | [XD]US3991004 (TAKEKOSHI TOHRU, et al); | [A]US4324884 (WHITE DWAIN M, et al); | [AD]US3833544 (TAKEKOSHI T, et al); | [AD]US4324882 (TAKEKOSHI TOHRU); | [AD]US3998840 (WILLIAMS III FRANK J, et al) |