EP0126789 - Antihemophilic factor concentrate and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | ||
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitra, Gautam 40 Cowper Avenue Kensington California 94707 / US | 02 /
Lundblad, John L. 1390 Club View Court El Cerrito California 94530 / US | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Adrian, Albert, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | Adrian, Albert, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und Technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1984/49] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105260.0 | 27.05.1983 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126789 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126789 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/16, C07K3/26, C07K3/28 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/49] | A61K35/16, C07G7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Antihaemophilisches Faktorkonzentrat und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1984/49] | English: | Antihemophilic factor concentrate and process for its preparation | [1984/49] | French: | Concentré de facteur antihémophilique et procédé pour sa préparation | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1983 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 13.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XE]US4386068 ; | [X]US4302445 ; | [XD]US4170639 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 66, no. 3, 16th January 1967, page 796, no. 8300f, Columbus, Ohio, US | [X] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, 1981, ref. no. 64302, Philadelphia, P.A., US | Examination | - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, 1981, ref. no. 64302, Philadelphia, P.A., US. MITRA GAUTAM et al.: "Studies of ultrafiltration of antihemophilic factor" & VOX SANG 40(2): 109-114, 1981 |