EP0104316 - Preparation of salts of low molecular weight copolymers using metal oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1988 [1988/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lences, Charles Francis 190 Beechwood Road Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | [1984/14] | Application number, filing date | 83105349.1 | 31.05.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | US19820405205 | 04.08.1982 Original published format: US 405205 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104316 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104316 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104316 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/44 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
C08F8/44 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/44, C08F210/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/14] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Copolymersalzen niedriger Molekulargewichte mit Metalloxyden | [1984/14] | English: | Preparation of salts of low molecular weight copolymers using metal oxides | [1984/14] | French: | Préparation de sels de copolymères de faible poids moléculaire à l'aide d'oxydes métalliques | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0054761 ; | [A]EP0017230 ; | [A]US3586659 ; | [A]FR1393730 |