EP0096805 - Coated polyamide monofilament [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1987 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, John Edward 218 Potomac Road Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [1983/52] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105428.3 | 01.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | US19820383455 | 01.06.1982 Original published format: US 383455 | US19820449498 | 13.12.1982 Original published format: US 449498 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096805 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096805 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/244, D06M15/263, A01K91/00, A46D1/00 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
D06M15/244 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/52] | D06M15/32, D06M15/38, A01K91/00, A46D1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/52] | Title | German: | Beschichtete Polyamidmonofaser | [1983/52] | English: | Coated polyamide monofilament | [1983/52] | French: | Monofilament de polyamide revêtir | [1983/52] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1574864 ; | [A]US2431056 (LOUDENSLAGER OSCAR W, et al) | [A] - INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY PROD. RES. DEVELOP., vol. 13, no. 2, 1974, pages 139-143 |