EP0096403 - Selective photochlorination of 1,1-dichloroethane with iodine catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevens, James Carl 3 Dan Court Midland Michigan, 48640 / US | 02 /
Perettie, Donald Joseph 3012 Travis Midland Michigan, 48640 / US | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105542.1 | 06.06.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | US19820385638 | 07.06.1982 Original published format: US 385638 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096403 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096403 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/05, C07C17/10 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
C07C17/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/10, C07C19/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1983/51] | Title | German: | Selektive Photochlorierung von 1,1-Dichloroäthan in Gegenwart eines Jodkatalysators | [1986/10] | English: | Selective photochlorination of 1,1-dichloroethane with iodine catalyst | [1983/51] | French: | Photochloruration sélective de 1,1-dichloroéthane en présence d'un catalyseur à iode | [1983/51] |
Former [1983/51] | Selektive Photochlorierung von 1,1-Dichloroäthan in Gegenwart von eines Jodkatalysators | Examination procedure | 19.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2049668 |