Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS58212649 | 10.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9496882 | 04.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS58212650 | 10.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9496982 | 04.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0096405 | Global Dossier | 16.03.1988 | B1 | EP0096405 | 21.12.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9496982 | 04.06.1982 | JP9496882 | 04.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3376038D1 | 21.04.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9496982 | 04.06.1982 | JP9496882 | 04.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4561084 | 24.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9496982 | 04.06.1982 | JP9496882 | 04.06.1982 |