EP0096405 - Disk loading and unloading system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states HITACHI VIDEO ENGINEERING, INC. 292, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI VIDEO ENGINEERING, INC. 292, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satake, Mitsuo Hitachi-Shirakawaryo 67-5, Michishita Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Toyota, Shigekata 55, Haseyama, Goyucho Toyokawa-shi / JP | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/51] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105544.7 | 06.06.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | JP19820094968 | 04.06.1982 Original published format: JP 9496882 | JP19820094969 | 04.06.1982 Original published format: JP 9496982 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096405 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096405 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04, G11B17/02 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
G11B17/054 (EP,US);
G11B17/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/01] |
Former [1983/51] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | System zum Einlegen und Entnehmen einer Platte | [1983/51] | English: | Disk loading and unloading system | [1983/51] | French: | Système de chargement et déchargement de disque | [1983/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 12.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3116056 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]GB2088113 (SHARP KK); | [AP]GB2093253 (SHARP KK); | [AP]EP0070556 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [AP]EP0076061 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | Examination | DE2909099 |