blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0113389

EP0113389 - Device for relieving the guideway for parts substantially movable in a vertical direction, particularly of machine tool parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.1985
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MDC Max Dätwyler Bleienbach AG
Flugplatz
CH-3368 Bleienbach / CH
[1984/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Dätwyler, Max
Thunstettenstrasse 13
CH-4900 Langenthal / CH
[1984/29]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 20
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1984/29]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
CH-8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date83105593.407.06.1983
[1984/29]
Priority number, dateCH1982000719610.12.1982         Original published format: CH 719682
[1984/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0113389
Date:18.07.1984
Language:DE
[1984/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.1984
ClassificationIPC:B23Q11/00
[1984/29]
CPC:
B23Q11/0014 (EP); B23Q1/015 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1984/29]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Entlasten der Führung für zumindest in im wesentlichen vertikaler Richtung bewegbare Bauteile, insbesondere von Bearbeitungsmaschinen, wie beispielsweise Werkzeugmaschinen[1984/29]
English:Device for relieving the guideway for parts substantially movable in a vertical direction, particularly of machine tool parts[1984/29]
French:Dispositif pour soulager la glissière de guidage pour organes mobiles principalement dans la direction verticale, en particulier organes de machines d'usinage[1984/29]
File destroyed:13.07.1991
Examination procedure02.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/03]
09.04.1985Application withdrawn by applicant  [1985/25]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2349468  ;
 [X]EP0063967  ;
 [A]DE2121340  ;
 [AD]GB2033796
 [X]  - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK, Band 61, Nr. 9, 1971, Berlin N. EWERTOWSKI "Neuzeitlicher Spindelstock mit verschiebbarem Spindelschlitten für Platten-Bohr- und Fräswerke", Seiten 536-540
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.