EP0096842 - Fuel injector body assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/52] | Air-intake conduit comprising a fuel injector for internal-combustion engines | ||
[1987/10] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karino, Kimiji 2387-136, Oaza Koya Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Kosuge, Tokuo 2330-11, Sugaya Nakamachi Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1987/10] |
Former [1984/04] | 01 /
Karino, Kimiji 2387-136, Oaza Koya Katsuta-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Kosuge, Tokuo 2330-11, Sugaya Nakamachi Tsuda Katsuta-shi / JP | |||
Former [1983/52] | 01 /
Karino, Kimiji 2387-136, Oaza Koya Katsuta-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Kosuge, Tokuo Mutsumiso 108-go, 2593 Tsuda Katsuta-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/52] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105627.0 | 08.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | JP19820097715 | 09.06.1982 Original published format: JP 9771582 | JP19820109994 | 28.06.1982 Original published format: JP 10999482 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096842 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096842 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0096842 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02M69/00 | [1983/52] | CPC: |
F02M69/18 (EP);
F02M69/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/02] |
Former [1983/52] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung eines Kraftstoffeinspritzventil | [1987/10] | English: | Fuel injector body assembly | [1987/10] | French: | Structure d'un injecteur de combustible | [1987/10] |
Former [1983/52] | Luftansaugkanal mit Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen | ||
Former [1983/52] | Air-intake conduit comprising a fuel injector for internal-combustion engines | ||
Former [1983/52] | Conduit d'air d'admission comprenant un injecteur de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne | Examination procedure | 07.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/29] | 19.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.1987
21.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.1987
21.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | 08.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.04.1994 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.12.1990 | Appeal received No. T0966/90 | 13.02.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 25.11.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.02.1991 | CH | 30.06.1992 | LI | 30.06.1992 | [1995/37] |
Former [1993/13] | FR | 28.02.1991 | |
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/01] | FR | 28.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3019544 ; | [X]GB2082252 ; | [A]US4264961 ; | [A]FR2461112 |