EP0097852 - Rotating mirror scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiya, Masashi 4-23-4, Sakuragaoka Tama-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Katsunobu 1365-3, Kamariya-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 03 /
Sumiya, Mitsuo 1504 Kurogane-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 04 /
Tsukada, Tameyasu 3-45-7, Sasazuka Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105665.0 | 09.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | JP19820107529 | 24.06.1982 Original published format: JP 10752982 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097852 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097852 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097852 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/471 (EP,US);
F16C17/028 (EP,US);
F16C33/1075 (EP,US);
F16C39/063 (EP,US);
G02B26/121 (EP,US);
G02B5/09 (EP,US);
G02B7/18 (EP,US);
H02K7/09 (EP,US);
F16C2370/22 (EP,US);
F16C3/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1984/02] | G02B27/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/02] | Title | German: | Rotierender Abtastspiegel | [1984/02] | English: | Rotating mirror scanner | [1984/02] | French: | Miroir de balayage tournant | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1983 | Examination requested [1984/02] | 10.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3874778 (KATO SHIGEO, et al); | [A]US4141620 (GOSHIMA TAKESHI, et al) |