blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0097294

EP0097294 - Workbench with detachable vice [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.1986
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.1986 [1986/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/01]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schaal, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Am Ochsenwald 25
D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
02 / Schramm, Heribert, Ing. grad.
Kremmlerstrasse 33
D-7000 Stuttgart 70 / DE
[1984/01]
Application number, filing date83105737.711.06.1983
[1984/01]
Priority number, dateDE1982322275018.06.1982         Original published format: DE 3222750
[1984/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0097294
Date:04.01.1984
Language:DE
[1984/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0097294
Date:02.10.1985
Language:DE
[1985/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1983
ClassificationIPC:B25H1/08
[1984/01]
CPC:
B25H1/10 (EP,US); B25B1/22 (EP,US); Y10S269/90 (EP,US);
Y10S269/901 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1984/01]
TitleGerman:Werkbank mit abnehmbarem Schraubstock[1984/01]
English:Workbench with detachable vice[1984/01]
French:Etabli pour travaux avec serre-joint amovible[1984/01]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure11.06.1983Examination requested  [1984/01]
27.11.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.01.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.1985Fee for grant paid
14.03.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS1407743  [ ] (WILLI FRANCK);
 DE929321  [ ] (FELLA WERKE GMBH);
 GB1348542  [ ] (GIBSON P C T);
 GB1405892  [ ] (HICKMAN R P);
 US4181296  [ ] (BASSETT ALVIN L [US]);
 EP0068258  [ ] (WEN PRODUCTS INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.