EP0100835 - Brazing material for bonding silicon carbide parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER SYSTEM GmbH Postfach 1360 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 1 / DE | [1984/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röttenbacher, Reinhard, Dr.-Ing. Flurstrasse 8a D-7777 Salem 3 / DE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105745.0 | 11.06.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | DE19823230320 | 14.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3230320 | [1984/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100835 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100835 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100835 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/00, B23K35/30 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
B23K35/30 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/658 (EP,US);
C04B2235/666 (EP,US);
C04B2237/16 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/704 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Lot zum Verbinden von Siliziumcarbidwerkstoffen | [1984/08] | English: | Brazing material for bonding silicon carbide parts | [1984/08] | French: | Matériau de brasage pour lier des pièces en carbure de silicium | [1984/08] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 30.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.04.1988 | NL | 20.04.1988 | SE | 30.04.1988 | CH | 30.06.1988 | LI | 30.06.1988 | [1990/02] |
Former [1989/23] | BE | 20.04.1988 | |
NL | 20.04.1988 | ||
SE | 30.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | BE | 20.04.1988 | |
NL | 20.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 20.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3813759 (HEAP H, et al); | [A]DE665006 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH) |