EP0109481 - Magnetic recording disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Joel Richard 17065 Copper Hill Drive Morgan Hill California 95037 / US | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83105929.0 | 16.06.1983 | [1984/22] | Priority number, date | US19820443515 | 22.11.1982 Original published format: US 443515 | [1984/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109481 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109481 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109481 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/64, G11B5/82 | [1984/22] | CPC: |
G11B5/64 (EP,US);
G11B5/7373 (EP,US);
G11B5/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/22] | Title | German: | Magnetische Aufzeichnungsplatte | [1984/22] | English: | Magnetic recording disk | [1984/22] | French: | Disque pour l'enregistrement magnétique | [1984/22] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/48] | 31.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58077027 ; | [A]JP57071518 ; | [A]JP57183633 ; | [A]EP0054640 (IBM [US]); | [A]GB2096647 (SONY CORP) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 172 (P-213)[1317], 29th July 1983; & JP - A - 58 077 027 (TOKYO DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 10-05-1983, & JP58077027 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 152 (P-134)[1030], 12th August 1982; & JP - A - 57 071 518 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 04-05-1982, & JP57071518 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 32 (P-174)[1177], 8th February 1983; & JP - A - 57 183 633 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 12-11-1982, & JP57183633 A 00000000 |