EP0097337 - Trip computer for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Mitsuhiro 1034, Higashiishikawa-2-chome Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Naito, Shotaro 3420-3, Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Tokuyama, Keiichi 1292-25, Tarazaki Katsuta-shi / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Shizuhisa Bouda-Apartment House 334 2593, Takaba Katsuta-shi / JP | [1984/01] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/01] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105934.0 | 16.06.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | JP19820103853 | 18.06.1982 Original published format: JP 10385382 | [1984/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097337 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097337 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01F9/00 | [1984/01] | CPC: |
G01F9/008 (EP,US);
G01F9/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/01] | Title | German: | Entfernungsrechner für Fahrzeuge | [1984/01] | English: | Trip computer for vehicles | [1984/01] | French: | Calculateur de distance pour véhicules | [1984/01] | File destroyed: | 02.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS56140216 ; | [Y]US3589176 (WELLONS JAMES J); | [A]US4031363 (FREEMAN JOHN D, et al) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 6, No. 18 (P-100) (896) February 21982 & JP-A-56 140 216 (Nippon Denso K.K.) 2-11-1981 & US-A-4 400 779 |