EP0097894 - Press for squeezing-out liquid-containing materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1987 [1987/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josef Willmes GmbH Bahnstrasse 81-83 64625 Bensheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states Josef Willmes GmbH Bahnstrasse 81-83 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Oskar Krehbergstrasse 9 D-6145 Lindenfels / DE | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter Reble & Klose Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.H. Fischer Dipl.-Ing. W.D. Fischer Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105966.2 | 18.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | DE19823224086 | 29.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3224086 | DE19833317448 | 13.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3317448 | [1984/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097894 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097894 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/22, B30B9/14 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
B30B9/22 (EP,US);
B30B9/12 (EP,US);
B30B9/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1986/14] |
Former [1984/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Presse zum Auspressen von flüssigkeitshaltigen Stoffen | [1984/02] | English: | Press for squeezing-out liquid-containing materials | [1984/02] | French: | Presse pour exprimer des substances contenant des liquides | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 25.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2456187 [ ] (SOENNECKEN ALF); | DE2252233 [ ] (UP RIGHT INC) |