EP0097364 - Stabilized suspended biochemical preparations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | For all designated states Von Stetten, Otto Blaubeurer Strasse 91 D-7933 Schelklingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Von Stetten, Otto Blaubeurer Strasse 91 D-7933 Schelklingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Stetten, Otto, Dr. Blaubeurer Strasse 91 D-7933 Schelklingen / DE | 02 /
Patzelt, Helmut, Dr. Obere Dorfstrasse 33 D-8702 Kist / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Helmut, Dr. Tilman-Riemenschneider-Strasse 15 D-8706 Höchberg / DE | [1984/01] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106047.0 | 21.06.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | DE19823223101 | 21.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3223101 | [1984/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097364 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097364 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/02, C12N11/00, G01N33/53, C07F7/02, C07F7/18, C08G77/38 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/552 (EP);
C12N11/089 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP);
C08G77/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/01] | C12N11/02, C12N11/00, G01N33/54, C07F7/02, C07F7/18, C08G77/38 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/12] |
Former [1984/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stabilisierte biochemische Suspensionspräparate | [1987/05] | English: | Stabilized suspended biochemical preparations | [1984/01] | French: | Préparations biochimiques stabilisées en suspension | [1984/01] |
Former [1984/01] | Stabilisierte biochemische suspensionspräparate | Examination procedure | 18.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, LU, NL | 28.12.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 04.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.07.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 21.07.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 21.07.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 21.07.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.01.1987 | SE | 31.01.1987 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/17] | SE | 31.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1915970 [ ] (ANVAR); | DE1944418 [ ] (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | DE2106215 [ ]; | US3652761 [ ] (WEETALL HOWARD H); | DE2905657 [ ] (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | DE2758507 [ ] |