EP0098533 - Process for production of glucosone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, Inc. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, Inc. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | ||
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, INC. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horwath, Robert O. 223 Bayberry Lane Westport Connecticut / US | 02 /
Ibrahim, Osama O. 5 Oak Crest Drive Brookfield Connecticut / US | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, Dr. rer. nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106389.6 | 30.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | US19820393850 | 30.06.1982 Original published format: US 393850 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098533 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098533 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/26, C12N9/04, C07H7/02 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US);
C12P7/58 (EP,US);
Y10S435/911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Glukoson | [1984/03] | English: | Process for production of glucosone | [1984/03] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de glucosone | [1984/03] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 16.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.02.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.1988 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/18] | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/18] | Appeal following examination | 12.05.1987 | Appeal received No. T0239/87 | 04.06.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]USRE29130E ; | [X]EP0042221 (CETUS CORP [US]); | [X]WO8103666 (STANDARD BRANDS INC [US]); | [X]WO8103665 (STANDARD BRANDS INC [US]) |