EP0098534 - Filter apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1987 [1987/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Champion, Helena Margaret 228 Puritan Rd. Swampscott MA, 01907 / US | 02 /
Pierog, Joseph John 3 Mildred St. Salem N.H. 03079 / US | 03 /
Peters, Joseph Edward 148 Fifty Acre Way Carlisle MA 01741 / US | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106390.4 | 30.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | US19820394225 | 01.07.1982 Original published format: US 394225 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098534 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098534 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, B01D25/04 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
B01D61/18 (EP);
B01L3/50255 (EP);
G01N33/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | Filtergerät | [1984/03] | English: | Filter apparatus | [1984/03] | French: | Appareil à filtrer | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 14.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4304865 [ ]; | US3540857 [ ]; | US3540858 [ ]; | US3540856 [ ]; | US3111489 [ ]; | GB2000694 [ ] | Examination | US3523408 | US4459139 | US768605 | US3238056 | US3649464 | US4276048 | US4154795 | US3158532 | US30562 |