EP0099077 - Fetal electrode apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kontron Incorporated 9 Plymouth Street Everett Massachusetts 02149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states KONTRON INCORPORATED 9 Plymouth Street Everett Massachusetts 02149 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lombardi, Edward J. 143 Oakland Street Malden Massachusetts / US | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/04] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Mitscherlich Dipl.-Ing. K. Gunschmann Dr.rer.nat. W. Körber Dipl.-Ing. J. Schmidt-Evers Dipl.-Ing. W. Melzer Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106669.1 | 07.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | US19820399073 | 16.07.1982 Original published format: US 399073 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099077 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099077 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099077 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/4362 (EP,US);
A61B5/288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/04] | Title | German: | Fötalelektrodenapparat | [1984/04] | English: | Fetal electrode apparatus | [1984/04] | French: | Appareil d'électrode foetal | [1984/04] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2149449 [ ] (VITATRON MEDICAL N V); | EP0004510 [ ] (ANVAR [FR]); | EP0007702 [ ] (NEWARD THEODORE CHESTER); | DE2843096 [ ] (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG); | US4321931 [ ] (HON EDWARD D) |