Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0101849 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0101849



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 207
12.04.1988 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Closing of application Search / examination 1
24.04.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.02.1987 Claims Search / examination 3
05.02.1987 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.02.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.02.1987 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.02.1987 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.12.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
02.12.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
11.11.1986 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.11.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.10.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.10.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.09.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
28.08.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.1986 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.07.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 64
16.06.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.05.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.04.1986 Description Search / examination 8
30.04.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.04.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
18.04.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.04.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.1986 Claims Search / examination 4
07.04.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.04.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.12.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.11.1985 Claims Search / examination 5
04.11.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
04.10.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.09.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.05.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.03.1985 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.11.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.10.1984 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
29.06.1984 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
15.03.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.01.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.12.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.12.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
21.07.1983 Authorisation Search / examination 1
21.07.1983 Drawings Search / examination 13
21.07.1983 Priority document Search / examination 30
21.07.1983 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1