Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0101849


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.04.1988 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.05.1988 [1988/21]
17.04.1987 (Expected) grant published on  03.06.1987 [1987/23]
22.03.1985 Change - representative published on  22.05.1985 [1985/21]
27.11.1984 Change - applicant published on  30.01.1985 [1985/05]
27.11.1984 Change - representative published on  30.01.1985 [1985/05]
05.07.1984 Request for examination filed published on  05.09.1984 [1984/36]
29.05.1984 Change - representative published on  01.08.1984 [1984/31]
06.01.1984 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.03.1984 [1984/10]