blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0101849

EP0101849 - Medicine, mixed calcium salts of polymeric anionic carboxylic acids and/or their sulfuric acid esters, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.1988
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.1988 [1988/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Algina Aktiengesellschaft
c/o Rensch Treuhand Baarer Strasse 43
CH-6301 Zug / CH
[1985/05]
Former [1984/10]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kulbe, Klaus Dieter, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Ritterstrasse 12
D-7031 Gärtringen 2 / DE
02 / Weber, Hans, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Bittenfelderstrasse 8
D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE
[1984/10]
Representative(s)Weisert, Annekäte, et al
Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/05]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Former [1984/31]Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Former [1984/10]Krause, Dieter
Tillmannsweg 4
D-14109 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date83106734.308.07.1983
[1984/10]
Priority number, dateDE1982322823128.07.1982         Original published format: DE 3228231
[1984/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0101849
Date:07.03.1984
Language:DE
[1984/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0101849
Date:03.06.1987
Language:DE
[1987/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1983
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/715, C08B37/00
[1984/10]
CPC:
A61K31/715 (EP,US); A61P13/02 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP); A61P3/14 (EP); C08B37/0045 (EP,US);
C08B37/0084 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/10]
TitleGerman:Arzneimittel, Calciummischsalze von polymeren, anionischen Carbonsäuren und/oder ihren Schwefelsäureestern, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[1984/10]
English:Medicine, mixed calcium salts of polymeric anionic carboxylic acids and/or their sulfuric acid esters, process for their preparation and their use[1984/10]
French:Médicament, sels mixtes de calcium d'acides carboxyliques anioniques polymériques et/ou leurs esters sulfuriques, procédé de préparation et leur usage[1984/10]
Examination procedure29.06.1984Examination requested  [1984/36]
23.05.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.04.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.11.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.1987Fee for grant paid
05.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.03.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB191313777  (INGHAM THOMAS);
 [Y]FR3068M  (ALEXANDER FARKAS [US]);
 [A]GB1125924  (ROUSSEL UCLAF);
 [Y]FR6649M  ;
 [A]GB1394741  (MEDICAL ALGINATES LTD);
 [Y]DE2759032  (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR)
by applicantFR3068E
 FR6649E
 GB1394741
 DE2505755
 DE2618083
 DE2759032
    - M.B. KAYE, ARCH. INTERN. MED., (1969), vol. 124, page 656
    - A.C. ALFREY; J.M. MISHELL; J. BURKS; S. R. CONTIGUGLIA; H. RUDOLPH; E. LEWIN; J.H. HOLMES, TRANS. AMER.SOC.ARTIF. INT.ORG., (1972), vol. 18, page 257
    - A.C. ALFREY; G.R. LEGENDRE; W.D. KAEHNY, NEW ENGL.J.MED., (1976), vol. 294, page 184
    - A.M. PIERIDES; W.G. EDWARDS JR.; U.X. CULLUM JR.; J.T. MCCALL; H.A. ELLIS, KIDNEY INTERN., (1980), vol. 18, page 115
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.