EP0099121 - Pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buyniski, Joseph P. 302 Rugby Road Syracuse New York / US | 02 /
Cavanagh, Robert L. 7684 Stonehedge Lane Manlius New York / US | 03 /
Gordon, Maxwell 513 Standish Drive Syracuse New York / US | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/04] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter J. Prof.Dr.Dr. Kinzebach W. Dr. & Partner Bauerstrasse 22 Postfach 780 D-8000 München 43 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106846.5 | 12.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | US19820397271 | 12.07.1982 Original published format: US 397271 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099121 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099121 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099121 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/64, A61K45/06, // (A61K37/64, 31:41) | [1984/04] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP);
A61K38/04 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D271/08 (EP);
C07D271/10 (EP);
C07D277/42 (EP);
C07D277/48 (EP);
C07D277/56 (EP);
C07D285/10 (EP);
C07D307/52 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/005, A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K38/04, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/04, A61K31/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/04] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1984/04] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions | [1984/04] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques | [1984/04] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 03.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4101650 (UMEZAWA HAMAO); | [AD]GB2067987 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) | Examination | US101650 |