EP0105103 - Microstrip antenna system having nonconductively coupled feedline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALL CORPORATION 345 South High Street Muncie Indiana 47302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | For all designated states BALL CORPORATION 345 South High Street Muncie Indiana 47302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Michael A. P.O.Box 997 Nederland Colorado 80466 / US | [1984/15] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106939.8 | 15.07.1983 | [1984/15] | Priority number, date | US19820407079 | 11.08.1982 Original published format: US 407079 | [1984/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105103 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105103 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105103 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38 | [1984/15] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0457 (EP,US);
H01Q21/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/15] | Title | German: | Streifenleiter-Antennensystem mit nichtleitender Kopplung | [1984/15] | English: | Microstrip antenna system having nonconductively coupled feedline | [1984/15] | French: | Système d'antenne microbande à couplage non-conductif | [1984/15] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 18.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.1990 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.1991 | BE | 31.07.1991 | LU | 31.07.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1993/03] | AT | 15.07.1991 | |
BE | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 31.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3938161 (SANFORD GARY G); | [AD]US4054874 (OLTMAN JR HENRY G); | [A]FR2471679 (LABO ELECTRONIQUE PHYSIQUE [FR]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROGAGATION, vol. AP-29, no. 1, January 1981, pages 25-37, New York, US; R.J.MAILLOUX et al.: "Microstrip array technology" |