EP0101884 - Monolithic semiconductor memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Kiyoo 17-6, Gakuenmachi-2-chome Higashikurume-shi / JP | 02 /
Hori, Ryoichi 2196-125, Hirai, Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107070.1 | 19.07.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | JP19820125687 | 21.07.1982 Original published format: JP 12568782 | JP19830004162 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: JP 416283 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101884 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101884 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
G11C7/18 (EP,US);
G11C11/34 (KR);
G11C11/407 (KR);
G11C5/063 (EP,US);
G11C7/10 (EP,US);
G11C7/1006 (EP,US);
H01L27/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/10] | Title | German: | Monolithischer Halbleiterspeicher | [1984/10] | English: | Monolithic semiconductor memory | [1984/10] | French: | Mémoire monolithique semi-conductrice | [1984/10] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/17] | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4056811 (BAKER ROGER T); | [A]US3789371 (MARKOWITZ S) |