Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
08.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |
06.04.1989 | First examination report | |
30.11.1988 | Change - representative | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] |
16.07.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] |
08.01.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] |
06.01.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.03.1984 [1984/10] |