EP0100941 - Method of decladding irradiated fuel elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1987 [1987/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALKEM GMBH Postfach 110069 D-6450 Hanau 11 / DE | [1984/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Wolfgang, Dr. Ameliastrasse 25 D-6450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Ennerst, Karl Hirschpfad 23 D-8752 Kleinostheim / DE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Mehl, Ernst, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107170.9 | 21.07.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | DE19823228979 | 03.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3228979 | [1984/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100941 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100941 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/34 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
G21C19/34 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP);
Y02W30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufarbeiten eines Kernreaktorbrennstabes | [1984/08] | English: | Method of decladding irradiated fuel elements | [1984/08] | French: | Procédé de dégainage des éléments combustibles de réacteurs nucléaires | [1984/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2373859 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]GB2073476 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [A]BE567254 ; | [A]FR2485396 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4296074 (YOSIM SAMUEL J); | [A]FR2080952 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]DE1589815 (KERNFORSCHUNG GMBH GES FUER) |