EP0099588 - Method of regenerating cation exchange membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1990 | Opposition rejected | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K.K. Musashino Kagaku Kenkyusho 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states K.K. Musashino Kagaku Kenkyusho 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishida, Konosuke 1630-110, Isohara Isohara-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirokawa, Masaru 1630-155, Isohara Isohara-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/05] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107203.8 | 22.07.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | JP19820127729 | 23.07.1982 Original published format: JP 12772982 | [1984/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099588 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099588 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099588 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B13/08, C08J5/22, B01J49/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
C08J5/2293 (EP,US);
C08J2327/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/05] | C25B13/08, C08J5/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regenerierung von Kationenaustauschermembranen | [1984/05] | English: | Method of regenerating cation exchange membrane | [1984/05] | French: | Méthode de régénération de membranes échangeuses de cations | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.1988
01.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Gendorf Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | [1988/37] | 22.09.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.07.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.07.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53037598 ; | [A]DE2750599 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 81 (C-78) [1058], 28th June 1978; & JP-A-53 037 598 (TOKUYAMA SODA K.K.) 06-04-1978, & JP53037598 A 00000000 |