EP0100955 - Monoclonal immunoglobulin M antibodies and method of preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMF INCORPORATED World Headquarters 777 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states AMF INCORPORATED World Headquarters 777 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreesman, Gorden R., Dr. 6704 Community Drive Houston, TX 77005 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Ronald C. 7600 Kirby Drive 714 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 03 /
Henkel, Richard D. 1815 Cortlandt Street Houston, TX 77008 / US | 04 /
Kendall, Cynthia E. 4416 Georgetown Dr. Colombia, MO 65201 / US | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107288.9 | 25.07.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | US19820402009 | 26.07.1982 Original published format: US 402009 | US19820402015 | 26.07.1982 Original published format: US 402015 | US19830503882 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: US 503882 | [1984/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100955 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100955 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/00, C12N15/00, G01N33/58, // C12R1/91, C12N5/00 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
C07K16/087 (EP);
G01N33/54306 (EP);
G01N33/56994 (EP);
G01N33/581 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Monoklonale Immunoglobulin-M-Antikörper und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1984/08] | English: | Monoclonal immunoglobulin M antibodies and method of preparation | [1984/08] | French: | Anticorps monoclonaux immunoglobuline M et procédé pour leur préparation | [1984/08] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/50] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8201072 ; | [YD]US4228237 ; | [YP]EP0071976 ; | [A]EP0023989 ; | [AP]FR2498760 | [X] - FEDERATION PROCEEDINGS (USA), vol. 41, no. 3, March 1982, page 597, abstract no. 1913: R.C. KENNEDY et al.: "Neutralization of herpes simplex virus with mono clonal antibodies" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, vol. 27, no. 8, August 1979, pages 1131-1139; Williams & Wilkins Co., Baltimore, (US) J.L. GUESDON et al.: "The use of avidin-biotin interaction in immunoenzymatic techniques" | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 10, 1984, page 8416, ref.no. 76338; Philadelphia, (US) K. ADLER-STORTHZ et al.: "Biotin-avidin-amplified enzyme immunoassay for detection of herpes simplex virus antigen in clinical specimens"; & J. CLIN. MICROBIOL. 18(6): 1329-1334, 1983 | [XP] - THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 130, no. 4, April 1983, pages 1943-1946; R.C. KENNEDY et al.: "Characteristics of a shared idiotype by two IgM anti-herpes simplex virus monoclonal antibodies that recognize different determinants" | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS/REVIEWS-REPORTS-MEETINGS, Annual meeting of the American Society for Microbiology (USA), 1983, vol. 83, no. O, page S49: D. ADLER-STORTHZ et al.: "Charateristics of a shared idiotype by 2 immuno globulin M anti-herpes simplex virus monoclonal antibodies that recognize different determinants" | [A] - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 29, no. 2, August 1980, pages 724-732; L. PEREIRA et al.: "Type-common and type-specific monoclonal antibody to herpes simplex virus type 1" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 3, July 20, 1981, page 316, ref.no. 20759u; Columbus, Ohio, (US) SU-MING HSU et al.: "A comparative study of the peroxidase-antiperoxidase method and an avidin-biotin complex method for studying polypeptide hormones with radioimmunoassay antibodies"; & AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL. 1981, 75(5) 734-8 |