EP0100089 - Laser oscillator with gas flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE Société anonyme dite: 54, rue La Boétie 75382 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/06] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE Société anonyme dite: 54, rue La Boétie F-75382 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lavarini, Bernard 18 Parc de Diane F-78350 Jouy en Josas / FR | [1984/06] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/06] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107327.5 | 26.07.1983 | [1984/06] | Priority number, date | FR19820013322 | 30.07.1982 Original published format: FR 8213322 | [1984/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100089 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100089 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/081, H01S3/03 | [1984/06] | CPC: |
H01S3/034 (EP,US);
H01S3/036 (EP,US);
H01S3/0818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/06] | Title | German: | Laseroszillator mit Gasfluss | [1984/06] | English: | Laser oscillator with gas flow | [1984/06] | French: | Oscillateur laser à flux gazeux | [1984/06] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 19.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4050036 (CHAMBERS WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]US4164366 (FRIEBERG ROBERT J [US], et al) | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 19, no. 5, 1 mars 1980, pages 778-789, New York, USA | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 17, no. 6, 15 mars 1978, pages 936-943, New York, USA | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 16, no. 5, mai 1977, pages 1192-1196, New York, USA | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOCIETY OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS, 29-31 juillet 1980, San Diego, California, vol. 251, pages 131-135, R.N. SHAGAM et al., Bellingham, Washington, USA |