EP0100094 - Ultrasonic blood flow imaging method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1993 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aloka Co. Ltd. 22-1 Mure 6-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/06] | For all designated states Aloka Co. Ltd. 22-1 Mure 6-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo181 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Namekawa, Koroku c/o Aloka Co. Ltd. 6-22-1 Mure Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [1984/06] | Representative(s) | Weber, Otto-Ernst Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys. Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/06] | Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys. Weber & Heim Hofbrunnstrasse 36 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107339.0 | 26.07.1983 | [1984/06] | Priority number, date | JP19820130503 | 28.07.1982 Original published format: JP 13050382 | [1984/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100094 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100094 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100094 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0100094 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06, G01P5/00, G01S7/62 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
G01S15/8979 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
G01N29/0609 (EP,US);
G01S7/52071 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/06] | A61B10/00, G01P5/00, G01S7/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bilddarstellung der Blutströmung mittels Ultraschall | [1984/06] | English: | Ultrasonic blood flow imaging method and apparatus | [1984/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de représentation du flux sanguin par ultrasons | [1984/06] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.1990
07.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.1990
07.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 09.05.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.11.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.12.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.06.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4205687 (CURRY GEORGE R [CA], et al); | [A]WO8000532 (HIGH STOY TECH [US]); | [A]US3614720 (LUDLUM BOBBY R) |