Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0100552
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.09.1991 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
23.08.1989 |
Opposition filed |
published on 11.10.1989 [1989/41] |
09.03.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] |
08.12.1988 |
Change - name/address |
published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
12.11.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] |
07.05.1987 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] |
10.06.1986 |
First examination report |
|
11.09.1985 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] |
28.02.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.05.1985 [1985/18] |
17.12.1983 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.1984 [1984/07] |