EP0101015 - Torsional vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METZELER KAUTSCHUK GMBH Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [1984/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Bernd Juchaczstrasse 56 D-5410 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Michelis, Theodor Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107653.4 | 03.08.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | DE19823229782 | 10.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3229782 | [1984/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101015 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
F16F15/1442 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/08] | Title | German: | Torsionsschwingungstilger | [1984/08] | English: | Torsional vibration damper | [1984/08] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations torsionelles | [1984/08] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 03.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 30.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2311228 ; | [X]FR2426842 ; | [A]FR2341073 ; | [A]US3314304 |