EP0101978 - Olefin polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welch, Melvin Bruce 4716 Barlow Drive Bartlesville Oklahoma 74003 / US | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/10] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107697.1 | 04.08.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | US19820405646 | 05.08.1982 Original published format: US 405646 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101978 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101978 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6357 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6381 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/10] | Title | German: | Polymerisation von Olefinen | [1984/10] | English: | Olefin polymerization | [1984/10] | French: | Polymérisation des oléfines | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 10.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007425 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]EP0000007 ; | [A]US4310648 (SHIPLEY RANDALL S, et al) |