EP0102002 - Toner dispensing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Takashi No. 19-15, Higashimine-Machi Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kawata, Shun No. 1-21-1, Daida Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107900.9 | 10.08.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | JP19820146439 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14643982 | JP19820146440 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644082 | JP19820146441 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644182 | JP19820146442 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644282 | JP19820146443 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644382 | JP19820146444 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644482 | JP19820146445 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644582 | JP19820146446 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14644682 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102002 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102002 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102002 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
G03G15/0882 (EP,US);
Y10S222/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/10] | Title | German: | Tonernachfüllvorrichtung | [1984/10] | English: | Toner dispensing apparatus | [1984/10] | French: | Dispositif distributeur de toner | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 11.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2452733 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]); | [A]US4062385 (KATUSHA JEROME MARK, et al); | [A]US3561647 (ALTMANN CONRAD); | [A]US3385500 (LAVANDER EDWARD J); | [A]US3388853 (MATICH JR THOMAS G); | [A]US4251001 (HIPP JR RICHARD D) |