EP0101081 - Orthopedic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmut Mueller Ingenieurgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Tempelseestrasse 58 D-6050 Offenbach/Main / DE | [1984/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramer, Hans Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Dessauer Strasse 5 D-6054 Rodgau 1 / DE | 02 /
Maegerlein, Werner R. Bindergasse 24 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1984/08] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107986.8 | 12.08.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | DE19823230724 | 18.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3230724 | [1984/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101081 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101081 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/00, A61H1/02, A61H23/00 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
A61H1/008 (EP);
A61H1/0229 (EP);
A61H2201/1635 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Orthopädisches Gerät | [1984/08] | English: | Orthopedic apparatus | [1984/08] | French: | Appareil orthopédique | [1984/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.05.1987 | FR | 13.05.1987 | IT | 13.05.1987 | NL | 13.05.1987 | SE | 31.05.1987 | AT | 12.08.1987 | CH | 31.08.1987 | LI | 31.08.1987 | LU | 31.08.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
IT | 13.05.1987 | ||
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
AT | 12.08.1987 | ||
CH | 31.08.1987 | ||
LI | 31.08.1987 | ||
LU | 31.08.1987 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
IT | 13.05.1987 | ||
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
AT | 12.08.1987 | ||
CH | 31.08.1987 | ||
LI | 31.08.1987 | ||
Former [1989/25] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
AT | 12.08.1987 | ||
CH | 31.08.1987 | ||
LI | 31.08.1987 | ||
Former [1989/18] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
AT | 12.08.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
AT | 12.08.1987 | ||
Former [1988/52] | BE | 13.05.1987 | |
NL | 13.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 13.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR829380 (FILIPPO SALVATI); | [A]FR1394109 ; | [A]US3364923 (JONES JIMMIE J); | [A]US3859990 (SIMON PETER J) |