EP0103743 - Hydrophilic, water-absorbing acrylonitrile polymer fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.08.1989 [1989/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/13] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeMaria, Francesco 952 Aqua Marine Drive Gulf Breeze Florida 32561 / US | 02 /
Streetman, William Edward 4003 Sharin Park Lane 20 Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US | [1984/13] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/13] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108037.9 | 13.08.1983 | [1984/13] | Priority number, date | US19820418863 | 16.09.1982 Original published format: US 418863 | [1984/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103743 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103743 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103743 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/54, D01D5/24, D01D5/253 | [1984/13] | CPC: |
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
D01F6/38 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2973 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/13] | Title | German: | Hydrophile, Wasser absorbierende Faser aus Polyacrylonitril | [1984/13] | English: | Hydrophilic, water-absorbing acrylonitrile polymer fiber | [1984/13] | French: | Fibre hydrophile, absorbant l'eau en polymère d'acrylonitrile | [1984/13] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.09.1988 | [1989/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0014803 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [A]EP0008849 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [A]GB2008024 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | [A]EP0051203 (BAYER AG [DE]) |