EP0104412 - Polymeric boron-nitrogen dopant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirtley, Stephen Wakefield 129 Northington Drive East Amherst New York 14051 / US | 02 /
Wooster, George Sidney 35 Pleasant Avenue Hamburg New York 15075 / US | [1988/01] |
Former [1984/15] | 01 /
Kirtley, Stephen Wakefield 129 Northington Drive Orchard Park New York 14127 / US | ||
02 /
Wooster, George Sidney 35 Pleasant Avenue Hamburg New York 15075 / US | |||
Former [1984/14] | 01 /
Kirtley, Stephen Wakefield 11 Thomaston Street Orchard Park New York 14127 / US | ||
02 /
Wooster, George Sidney 35 Pleasant Avenue Hamburg New York 15075 / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108196.3 | 19.08.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | US19820421945 | 23.09.1982 Original published format: US 421945 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0104412 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104412 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/225, C08L75/04, C08G79/08, C30B31/02 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/2254 (EP);
D04H5/06 (KR);
C08G79/08 (EP);
C08L85/04 (EP);
C30B31/02 (EP);
H01L21/2225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/14] | H01L21/22, H01L21/225, C08G79/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/14] | Title | German: | Polymeres Bor und Stickstoff enthaltendes Dotiermaterial | [1984/14] | English: | Polymeric boron-nitrogen dopant | [1984/14] | French: | Matériel de dopage polymérique contenant du bore et de l'azote | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 29.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1012317 [ ] (UNITED STATES BORAX CHEM [US]); | US3375274 [ ] (FAUST JOHN P, et al); | US3341474 [ ] (BRADFORD JAMES L, et al); | GB1018031 [ ] (NAT RES DEV); | US3166520 [ ] (ENGLISH WILLIAM D [US], et al); | GB1485484 [ ] (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | DE2614324 [ ] (GRIBOV); | AT338335B [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 1959, part III, London AUBREY, LAPPERT "Cyclic Organic Boron Compounds", pages 2927-2931 |