EP0103237 - Method of making resin-encapsulated coils for transformers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Katzwanger Strasse 150 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | [1987/02] |
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Deckerstrasse 1 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Esslinger Steige 42 D-7312 Kirchheim/unter Teck / DE | 02 /
Bendel, Wolfgang Dobelstrasse 58 D-7250 Leonberg 1-Gebersheim / DE | 03 /
Dedelmahr, Rudolf Sulzweg 27 D-7447 Aischtal / DE | 04 /
Pfeiffer, Richard, Dr. Jagdweg 43b D-8504 Stein-Deutenbach / DE | [1984/12] | Representative(s) | Mehl, Ernst, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/12] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108604.6 | 31.08.1983 | [1984/12] | Priority number, date | DE19823234098 | 14.09.1982 Original published format: DE 3234098 | [1984/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103237 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103237 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103237 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/12 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
H01F41/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung in Giessharz eingebetteter Wicklungen für Transformatoren | [1984/12] | English: | Method of making resin-encapsulated coils for transformers | [1984/12] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'enroulements encapsulés en résine pour transformateurs | [1984/12] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57134917 ; | [A]DE1251863 ; | [A]FR429263 (JONH LEWIS MILTON [US]); | [A]GB204491 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US1616063 (NOVOTNY EMIL E, et al); | [A]GB586001 (TELEPHONE MFG CO LTD, et al); | [A]US3377602 (KRUSE FREDERICK E); | [A]DE1490909 (LIEBKNECHT TRANSFORMAT); | [A]DE2041047 (CIBA GEIGY); | [A]US3796621 (BUTCHER L); | [A]DE2733024 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2927400 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0031576 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 234(E-143)(1112), 20. November 1982; & JP-A-57 134 917 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 20.08.1982, & JP57134917 A 00000000 |