EP0134292 - Determination of carbohydrate acceptors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago Illinois 60064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rittenhouse, Harry George 130 East Prospect Avenue Lake Bluff Illinois / US | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 83108841.4 | 08.09.1983 | [1985/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134292 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134292 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C12Q1/48 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/48 (EP);
G01N33/566 (EP);
G01N33/57469 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/12] | Title | German: | Bestimmung von Kohlhydratakzeptoren | [1985/12] | English: | Determination of carbohydrate acceptors | [1985/12] | French: | Détermination d'accepteurs d'hydrates de carbone | [1985/12] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4132600 ; | [XD]US4261976 ; | [X]GB1550914 | [X] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 68, no. 1, January 1979, page 378, no. 3808, Philadelphia, US | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 21, 23rd May 1983, page 464, no. 177051s, Columbus, Ohio, US |