EP0103279 - Method for the crystallization of poly(arylene sulfide) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senatore, Guy 5221 S.E. Nowata Rd. Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US | 02 /
Scoggins, Lacey Eugene 1310 S.E. Lariat Dr. Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US | [1984/12] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/12] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108884.4 | 08.09.1983 | [1984/12] | Priority number, date | US19820416209 | 09.09.1982 Original published format: US 416209 | [1984/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0103279 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103279 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0103279 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L81/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kristallisieren von Arylensulfidpolymeren | [1984/12] | English: | Method for the crystallization of poly(arylene sulfide) | [1984/12] | French: | Procédé de cristallisation de polymères de sulfure d'arylène | [1984/12] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 12.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 21.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1988
05.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1988
05.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 07.10.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.04.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.05.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.10.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4017450 (BAILEY FAY W); | [X]DE3143992 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [AP]EP0067676 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) |