EP0107028 - Circuit arrangement with a transistor output circuit and a protection circuit for limiting the output current of the transistor output circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/18] | Circuit arrangement | ||
[1989/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalkhof, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosenbach 10 D-7410 Reutlingen 28 / DE | 02 /
Nagel, Karl Grundstrasse 24 D-7419 Gomaringen / DE | [1984/18] | Application number, filing date | 83109227.5 | 17.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | DE19823238880 | 21.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3238880 | [1984/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107028 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107028 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107028 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/08 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
H03K17/0826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/18] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung mit einer Ausgangstransistorschaltung und einer Schutzschaltung zur Begrenzung des Ausgangsstroms der Ausgangstransistorschaltung | [1989/03] | English: | Circuit arrangement with a transistor output circuit and a protection circuit for limiting the output current of the transistor output circuit | [1989/03] | French: | Montage de circuit avec un circuit à transistor de sortie et un circuit de protection pour limiter le courant de sortie du circuit à transistor de sortie | [1989/03] |
Former [1984/18] | Schaltungsanordnung | ||
Former [1984/18] | Circuit arrangement | ||
Former [1984/18] | Montage de circuit | Miscellaneous | EPB 1988/11: Teilanmeldung 87118980 eingereicht am 21.12.87 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87118980.9 / EP0281684 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8201105 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [A]FR2301948 (ITT [US]); | [AP]US4359652 (JARRETT ROBERT B, et al); | [A]GB2042297 (RCA CORP); | [A]US3792316 (BONDINI A, et al) | [Y] - ELECTRONICS, Band 47, Nr. 3, 7. Februar 1974, Seiten 119-123, New York, US; R.C. DOBKIN: "IC with load protection simulates power transistor" |